No. 17-512 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Robert Earl Butts, Petitioner
v.
Eric Sellers, Warden
Docketed:October 4, 2017
Linked with 17A31
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15691)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 2, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 30 2017Application (17A31) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 31, 2017 to September 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jul 05 2017Application (17A31) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 29, 2017.
Sep 29 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 3, 2017)
Oct 17 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 18, 2017.
Dec 18 2017Brief of respondent Eric Sellers, Warden in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 10 2018Reply of petitioner Robert Earl Butts filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joshua Christopher Toll
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

jtoll@kslaw.com
(202) 737-8616
Party name: Robert Earl Butts
Attorneys for Respondent
Patricia Beth Burton
    Counsel of Record
State Law Department
40 Capitol Square, SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

bburton@law.ga.gov
404-656-3300
Party name: Eric Sellers, Warden