No. 17-504
Vide 17-498, 17-499, 17-500, 17-501, 17-502, 17-503
Title:United States Telecom Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
Federal Communications Commission, et al.
Docketed:October 3, 2017
Linked with 17A54
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1063, 15-1078, 15-1086, 15-1090, 15-1091, 15-1092, 15-1095, 15-1099, 15-1117, 15-1128, 15-1151, 15-1164)
   Decision Date:June 14, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:May 1, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 10 2017Application (17A54) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 30, 2017 to September 28, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jul 20 2017Application (17A54) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 28, 2017.
Sep 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 2, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Blanket Consent filed by petitioners, United States Telecom Association, et al.VIDED
Oct 13 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent-intervenors, Free Press, Open Technology Institute-New America, and Public Knowledge.(VIDED)
Oct 13 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent-intervenor, Cogent Communications, Inc.(VIDED)
Oct 14 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent-intervenor, Center for Democracy & Technology VIDED
Oct 18 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent-intervenor, Akamai Technologies, Inc. VIDED
Oct 23 2017Waiver of right of respondent NCTA - The Internet and Television Association to respond filed.
Oct 24 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent-intervenor, Ad Hoc Telecommunications Users Committee VIDED
Oct 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 4, 2017, for all respondents.
Oct 25 2017Waiver of right of respondent CTIA - The Wireless Association to respond filed.
Oct 30 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent, NCTA - The Internet and Television Association. VIDED
Nov 01 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent-intervenors, COMPTEL (d/b/a INCOMPAS), et al. VIDED
Nov 02 2017Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Nov 02 2017Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc., et al. filed. VIDED.
Nov 08 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, CTIA - The Wireless Association.
Nov 22 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 4, 2017 to January 3, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 27 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 3, 2018, for all respondents.
Dec 18 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 3, 2018 to February 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 19 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 2, 2018, for all respondents.
Jan 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2018 to March 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 5, 2018, for all respondents.
Mar 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2018 to April 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 4, 2018, for all respondents.
Mar 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 4, 2018 to May 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 4, 2018
Apr 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2018 to June 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 4, 2018, for all respondents.
May 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 15, 2018, for all respondents.
May 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 4, 2018 to August 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
(202) 326-7900
Party name: United States Telecom Association, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Michael Cooper
    Counsel of Record
1401 New York Avenue, NW
11th Floor
Washington, DC 20005

202 237 2727
Party name: Cogent Communications, Inc.
Markham C. Erickson
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson, LLP
1330 Connections Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-1795

merickson@steptoe.com
202 429 3000
Party name: COMPTEL (d/b/a INCOMPAS), et al.
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

mestrada@gibsondunn.com
(202) 955-8500
Party name: NCTA - The Internet and Television Association
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Communications Commission
Lisa Antoinette Hayes
    Counsel of Record
Center for Democracy & Technology
1401 K Street, Suite 200
Washington, DC 20005

lhayes@cdt.org
202-637-9800
Party name: Center for Democracy & Technology
Stephen J. Rosen
    Counsel of Record
Levine Blaszak Block & Boothby, LLP
2001 L Street, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20036

202 875 2550
Party name: Ad Hoc Telecommunications Users Committee
Kevin K. Russell
    Counsel of Record
5225 Wisconsin Ave., NW
Suite 404
Washington, DC 20015

krussell@goldsteinrussell.com
2023620636
Party name: Free Press, Open Technology Institute-New America, and Public Knowledge
Helgi C. Walker
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

hwalker@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3599
Party name: CTIA - The Wireless Association
Christopher J. Wright
    Counsel of Record
Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis, LLP
1919 M Street, NW, Fl. 8
Washignton, DC 20036

cwright@hwglaw.com
202-333-1300
Party name: Akamai Technologies, Inc.
Other
Oliver J. Dunford
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

odunford@pacificlegal.org
916-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation, et al.
Chris Fedeli
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc., 425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

cfedeli@judicialwatch.org
(202)-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc., et al.