No. 17-481
Title:AMCI Holdings, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
CBF Industria De Gusa S/A, et al.
Docketed:October 2, 2017
Linked with 17A29
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1133)
   Decision Date:March 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 1, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 30 2017Application (17A29) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 30, 2017 to August 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jul 05 2017Application (17A29) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until August 29, 2017.
Aug 09 2017Application (17A29) to extend further the time from August 29, 2017 to September 28, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Aug 14 2017Application (17A29) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until September 28, 2017.
Sep 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 1, 2017)
Oct 17 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, AMCI Holdings, Inc., et al.
Nov 01 2017Brief amicus curiae of Professor George A. Bermann filed.
Nov 01 2017Brief of respondents CBF Industria de Gusa S/A, et al. in opposition filed.
Nov 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Nov 20 2017Reply of AMCI Holdings, Inc., et al. submitted.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Thomas C. Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tg@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: AMCI Holdings, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Adam K. Grant
    Counsel of Record
Day Pitney LLP
7 Times Square
Times Square Tower
New York, NY 10036

agrant@daypitney.com
(212) 297-5800
Party name: CBF Industria de Gusa S/A, et al.
Other
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Erik S. Jaffe, P.C.
5101 34th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

jaffe@esjpc.com
202-237-8165
Party name: Professor George A. Bermann