No. 17-475
Title:Securities and Exchange Commission, Petitioner
v.
David F. Bandimere
Docketed:September 29, 2017
Linked with 17A101
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-9586)
   Decision Date:December 27, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:May 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 21 2017Application (17A101) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 1, 2017 to August 31, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Jul 24 2017Application (17A101) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 31, 2017.
Aug 18 2017Application (17A101) to extend further the time from August 31, 2017 to September 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Aug 22 2017Application (17A101) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until September 29, 2017.
Sep 29 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2017)
Oct 10 2017Brief of respondent David F. Bandimere in opposition filed.
Oct 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Oct 24 2017Brief amici curiae of Raymond J. Lucia and Raymond J. Lucia Companies, Inc. filed.
Oct 25 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 25 2017Reply of petitioner Securities and Exchange Commission filed.
Dec 01 2017Supplemental brief of respondent David F. Bandimere filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Securities and Exchange Commission
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark Christopher Fleming
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
60 State Street
Boston, MA 02109

mark.fleming@wilmerhale.com
617 526 6000
Party name: David F. Bandimere
Other
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Raymond J. Lucia and Raymond J. Lucia Companies, Inc.