No. 17-467
Title:Andrew Kisela, Petitioner
v.
Amy Hughes
Docketed:September 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-15059)
   Decision Date:November 28, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:June 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2017)
Oct 20 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 4, 2017.
Dec 04 2017Brief of respondent Amy Hughes in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2017Reply of petitioner Andrew Kisela filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
2005 N. Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
602-542-3333
Party name: Andrew Kisela
Attorneys for Respondent
David Michael Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Bluhm Legal Clinic
375 East Chicago Avenue
Chicago, IL 60611-3069

david.shapiro@law.northwestern.edu
312-503-0711
Party name: Amy Hughes