No. 17-464
Title:Connecticut, Petitioner
v.
Nina C. Baccala
Docketed:September 28, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Connecticut
   Case Numbers:(SC 19717)
   Decision Date:July 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2017)
Oct 23 2017Brief of respondent Nina Baccala in opposition filed.
Oct 23 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Nina Baccala.
Nov 03 2017Reply of petitioner Connecticut filed.
Nov 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mitchell S. Brody
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Chief State's Attorney
300 Corporate Place
Rocky Hill, CT 06067

Mitchell.Brody@ct.gov
(860) 258-5807
Party name: Connecticut
Attorneys for Respondent
John L. Cordani Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Carmody Torrance Sandak & Hennessey, LLP
50 Leavenworth Street
Waterbury, CT 06721

jlcordani@carmodylaw.com
203 573 1200
Party name: Nina Baccala