No. 17-459
Title:Wescley Fonseca Pereira, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:September 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1033)
   Decision Date:July 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 30, 2017)
Oct 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2017.
Oct 30 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association filed.
Nov 15 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 29, 2017 to December 12, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 16 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 12, 2017.
Dec 12 2017Brief of respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 13 2017Waiver of the 14-day waiting period under Rule 15.5 filed by petitioner.
Main Document
Dec 19 2017Reply of petitioner Wescley Fonseca Pereira filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 12 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jan 25 2018As Rule 34.6 provides, “If the Court schedules briefing and oral argument in a case that was governed by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c) or Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1(c), the parties shall submit electronic versions of all prior and subsequent filings with this Court in the case, subject to [applicable] redaction rules.” Subsequent party and amicus filings in the case should now be submitted through the Court’s electronic filing system, with any necessary redactions.
Feb 21 2018Brief of petitioner Wescley Fonseca Pereira filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed.)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 23 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, April 23, 2018.
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Immigrant Justice Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Former BIA Chairman & Immigration Judge Schmidt filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018CIRCULATED
Mar 23 2018Brief of respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Mar 30 2018Record requested from U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Apr 02 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Apr 13 2018Reply of petitioner Wescley Fonseca Pereira filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2018Argued. For petitioner: David J. Zimmer, Boston, Mass. For respondent: Frederick Liu, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.
Jun 21 2018Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Sotomayor, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Kennedy, Thomas, Ginsburg, Breyer, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Kennedy, J., filed a concurring opinion. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
901 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

wjay@goodwinlaw.com
202-346-4000
Party name: Wescley Fonseca Pereira
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Other
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
202-362-0636
Party name: Former BIA Chairman & Immigration Judge Schmidt
Bradley N. Garcia
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
1625 Eye St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bgarcia@omm.com
202 383 5300
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association, et al.
Lindsay C. Harrison
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

LHarrison@jenner.com
(202)-639-6000
Party name: National Immigrant Justice Center