No. 17-449
Title:American Triumph LLC, et al., Petitioners
v.
Allan A. Tabingo
Docketed:September 25, 2017
Linked with 17A75
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(92913-1)
   Decision Date:March 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 10, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2017Application (17A75) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 8, 2017 to September 7, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jul 19 2017Application (17A75) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 7, 2017.
Aug 18 2017Application (17A75) to extend further the time from September 7, 2017 to October 7, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Aug 22 2017Response to application from respondent Allan A. Tabingo filed.
Aug 25 2017Application (17A75) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 22, 2017.
Sep 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2017)
Sep 28 2017Waiver of right of respondent Allan A. Tabingo to respond filed.
Oct 11 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 12 2017Response Requested. (Due November 13, 2017)
Oct 17 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, American Triumph LLC, et al.
Nov 10 2017Brief amicus curiae of Maritime Law Association filed.
Nov 13 2017Brief amicus curiae of Coastal Marine Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Nov 13 2017Brief amici curiae of At-sea Processors Association, Pacific Seafood Processors Association, Groundfish Forum, United Catcher Boats, Freezer Longline Coalition, National Fisheries Institute, Alaska Bering Sea Crabbers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondent Allan A. Tabingo in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Seth P. Waxman
    Counsel of Record
1875 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

(202) 663-6000
Party name: American Triumph LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Philip Albert Talmadge
    Counsel of Record
Talmadge/Fitzpatrick/Tribe
2775 Harbor Avenue SW
Third Floor, Suite C
Seattle, WA 98126

phil@tal-fitzlaw.com
206-574-6661
Party name: Allan A. Tabingo
Other
Michael A. Barcott
    Counsel of Record
Holmes Weddle & Barcott
999 Third Avenue
Suite 2600
Seattle, WA 98104

mbarcott@hwb-law.com
206-292-8008
Party name: Coastal Marine Fund
Molly J. Henry
    Counsel of Record
Keesal, Young & Logan
1301 Fifth Ave., Suite 3100
Seattle, WA 98101

(206) 622-3790
Party name: Maritime Law Association
Evan Mark Tager
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

etager@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: At-sea Processors Association, Pacific Seafood Processors Association, Groundfish Forum, United Catcher Boats, Freezer Longline Coalition, National Fisheries Institute, Alaska Bering Sea Crabbers