No. 17-443
Title:R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, Petitioner
v.
Sharon Block, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lillian Kaplan, Deceased
Docketed:September 25, 2017
Linked with 17A66
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fourth District
   Case Numbers:(4D16-141)
   Decision Date:April 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 14 2017Application (17A66) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 26, 2017 to September 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jul 18 2017Application (17A66) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 24, 2017.
Sep 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 25, 2017)
Sep 26 2017Waiver of right of respondent Sharon Block to respond filed.
Oct 11 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 16 2017Response Requested. (Due November 15, 2017)
Oct 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 15, 2017.
Nov 17 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 16, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

202-879-3939
Party name: R.J. Tobacco Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard B. Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Richard B. Rosenthal, P.A.
1581 Brickell Avenue
Suite 1408
Miami, FL 33129

rbr@rosenthalappeals.com
(305)-992 6089
Party name: Sharon Block