No. 17-432
Title:China Agritech, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Michael H. Resh, et al.
Docketed:September 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55432)
   Decision Date:May 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2017)
Oct 12 2017Waiver of right of respondent Charles Law to respond filed.
Oct 23 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Oct 23 2017Brief of respondents William Schoenke, Heroca Holding, B.V. and Ninella Beheer, B.V. in opposition filed.
Nov 07 2017Reply of petitioner China Agritech, Inc. filed.
Nov 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 08 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. GRANTED.
Dec 08 2017Petition GRANTED.
Jan 17 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, China Agritech, Inc..
Blanket Consent
Jan 22 2018Brief of petitioner China Agritech, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 22 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 24 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, March 26, 2018
Jan 24 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, William Schoenke, Heroca Holding, B.V. and Ninella Beheer, B.V..
Blanket Consent
Jan 26 2018Brief amicus curiae of DRI--The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018CIRCULATED
Feb 21 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 9th Circuit.
Feb 21 2018Brief of respondents William Schoenke, Heroca Holding, B.V. and Ninella Beheer, B.V. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Supplemental joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed) (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
Feb 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Plaintiffs in Post-Dukes Successor Class Actions filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of Retired Federal Judges filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Conference on Public Employee Retirement Systems filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of AARP and AARP Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amici curiae of American Association for Justice, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2018Reply of petitioner China Agritech, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Argued. For petitioner: Seth A. Aronson, Los Angeles, Cal. For respondents: David C. Frederick, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Seth Alben Aronson
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
400 South Hope Street
Los Angeles, CA 90071

saronson@omm.com
(213) 430-6000
Party name: China Agritech, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Charles Eric Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
2020 West El Camino Avenue
Suite 700
Sacramento, CA 95833

Charles.Coleman@lewisbrisbois.com
916--564-5400
Party name: Charles Law
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: William Schoenke, Heroca Holding, B.V. and Ninella Beheer, B.V.
Matthew Moylan GuineyWolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP
270 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10016

guiney@whafh.com
212.545.4600
Party name: William Schoenke, Heroca Holding, B.V. and Ninella Beheer, B.V.
Other
George Edward Anhang
    Counsel of Record
Cooley LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20004

GAnhang@Cooley.com
2028427880
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Max W. Berger
    Counsel of Record
Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP
1251 Avenue of the Americas, 44th Floor
New York, NY 10020

MWB@blbglaw.com
212-554-1403
Party name: National Conference on Public Employee Retirement Systems
Andrew Nathan Goldfarb
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
1800 M Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

agoldfarb@zuckerman.com
2027781822
Party name: Retired Federal Judges
Deepak Gupta
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

deepak@guptawessler.com
(202) 888-1741
Party name: American Association for Justice, et al.
Lewis Jeffrey Liman
    Counsel of Record
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
One Liberty Plaza
New York, NY 10006

lliman@cgsh.com
2122252550
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association
Lumen N. Mulligan
    Counsel of Record
University of Kansas School of Law
1535 W. 15th Street
Lawrence, KS 66045

lumen@ku.edu
(785) 691-9367
Party name: Law Professors
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Julie Nepveu
    Counsel of Record
AARP Foundation Litigation
601 E. Street, NW
Washington, DC 20049

jnepveu@aarp.org
(202)-434-2075
Party name: AARP and AARP Foundation
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8500
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Joseph Marc Sellers
    Counsel of Record
Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll PLLC
1100 New York Avenue NW
Suite 500
Washington, DC 20005

jsellers@cohenmilstein.com
202-408-4600
Party name: Plaintiffs in Post-Dukes Successor Class Actions
Robert Latane Wise
    Counsel of Record
Bowman and Brooke LLP
901 East Byrd Street
Suite 1650
Richmond, VA 23219

rob.wise@bowmanandbrooke.com
804-649-8200
Party name: DRI--The Voice of the Defense Bar
Susan E. BurnettBowman and Brooke LLP
2901 Via Fortuna Dr.
Austin, TX 89846

susan.burnett@bowmanandbrooke.com
(512) 874-3844
Party name: DRI--The Voice of the Defense Bar
Lyle RobertsCooley LLP
1299 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 700
Washington, DC 20004

lroberts@cooley.com
202 842-7880
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation