No. 17-431
Title:Recycle for Change, Petitioner
v.
City of Oakland, California
Docketed:September 22, 2017
Linked with 17A133
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-15295)
   Decision Date:May 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 28 2017Application (17A133) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 7, 2017 to October 6, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jul 31 2017Application (17A133) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 21, 2017.
Sep 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 23, 2017)
Oct 18 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 22, 2017.
Oct 23 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Textile Recycling Service, Inc. filed.
Nov 06 2017Brief of respondent City of Oakland in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Anthony Scodro
    Counsel of Record
Mayer and Brown
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

(312) 701-8886
Party name: Recycle for Change
Attorneys for Respondent
Selia Monique Acevedo Warren
    Counsel of Record
Office of the City Attorney
1 Frank H. Ogawa Plaza, 6th Floor
Oakland, CA 94612

swarren@oaklandcityattorney.org
510-238-3601
Party name: City of Oakland
Other
Stephen A. Miller
    Counsel of Record
1650 Market Street, Suite 2800
Philadelphia, PA 19103

samiller@cozen.com
215 665 4736
Party name: American Textile Recycling Service, Inc.