No. 17-43
Title:Los Rovell Dahda, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 7, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3236)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2017)
Aug 02 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017.
Sep 06 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 20 2017Reply of petitioner Los R. Dahda filed. (Distributed)
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 16 2017Petition GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition.
Nov 15 2017Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Nov 16 2017Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including January 5, 2018.
Nov 28 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Los R. Dahda
Blanket Consent
Nov 30 2017Brief of petitioner Los R. Dahda filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 30 2017Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 30 2017Motion to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal filed by petitioners Los R. Dahda.
Dec 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Rutherford Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Electronic Frontier Foundation and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 20 2017SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, February 21, 2018
Jan 05 2018CIRCULATED
Jan 05 2018Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 08 2018Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit.
Jan 16 2018Record from the U.S.C.A. 10th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER with the exception of the pleadings enclosed in 1 box.
Jan 22 2018Motion to file Volume II of the joint appendix under seal GRANTED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Feb 05 2018Reply of petitioner Los R. Dahda filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2018Argued. For petitioner: Kannon K. Shanmugam, Washington, D.C. For respondent: Zachary D. Tripp, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005-5901

kshanmugam@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: Los R. Dahda
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Erin Glenn Busby
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

egbusby@swbell.net
7139660409
Party name: The Rutherford Institute
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LL P (US)
One Liberty Place
1650 Market Street, Suite 4900
Philadelphia, PA 19109

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-668-9715
Party name: Electronic Frontier Foundation and National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center