No. 17-424
Title:Sylvester Turner, Mayor of the City of Houston, Texas, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jack Pidgeon, et al.
Docketed:September 20, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Texas
   Case Numbers:(15-0688)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 20, 2017)
Oct 19 2017Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed.
Oct 20 2017Brief amici curiae of Professors of Constitutional and Family Law filed.
Oct 20 2017Brief of respondents Jack Pidgeon, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 20 2017Brief amici curiae of Mark Phariss & Victor Holmes filed.
Oct 20 2017Brief amici curiae of GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al. filed.
Oct 20 2017Brief amici curiae of LGBT Bar Association and Equality Texas filed.
Nov 06 2017Reply of petitioners Turner, Mayor, et al. filed.
Nov 08 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Wallace Bernard Jefferson
    Counsel of Record
Alexander Dubose Jefferson & Townsend LLP
515 Congress Avenue
Suite 2350
Austin, TX 78701-3562

wjefferson@adjtlaw.com
(512) 482-9300
Party name: Turner, Mayor, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jonathan F. Mitchell
    Counsel of Record
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jfmitche@stanford.edu
(650) 723-1397
Party name: Jack Pidgeon, et al.
Other
Elizabeth G. Bloch
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell, LLP
111 Congress, Suite 1400
Austin, TX 78701

heidi.bloch@huschblackwell.com
(512)-472-5456
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.
Mary L. Bonauto
    Counsel of Record
National Center for Lesbian Rights
870 Market Street
Boston, MA 94102

415-392-6257
Party name: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al.
Danielle J. Healey
    Counsel of Record
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
1221 McKinney Street
Suite 2800
Houston, TX 77010

healey@fr.com
713-654-5300
Party name: LGBT Bar Association and Equality Texas
Michael Joseph Malecek
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer, LLP
3000 El Camino Real Five Palo Alto Square
Suite 500
Pal Atlo, CA 94306-3807

michael.malecek@apks.com
650 319 4508
Party name: Professors of Constitutional and Family Law
Jason Paul Steed
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

jsteed@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-922-7112
Party name: Mark Phariss & Victor Holmes