No. 17-42
Vide 17-40
Title:Desert Water Agency, et al., Petitioners
v.
Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians, et al.
Docketed:July 7, 2017
Linked with 16A958
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55896)
   Decision Date:March 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 07 2017Application (16A958) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2017 to July 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 10 2017Application (16A958) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 5, 2017.
Jul 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2017)
Jul 10 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioners.
Jul 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017, for all respondents.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Aug 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Association of California Water Agencies, et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 07 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Nevada, et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 31 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 6, 2017, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Roderick E. Walston
    Counsel of Record
Best Best & Krieger LLP
2001 N Main Street, Suite 390
Walnut Creek, CA 94596

roderick.walston@bbklaw.com
(925) 977-3300
Party name: Desert Water Agency, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Adam H. Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton LLP
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
(214) 922-7100
Party name: Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians
Jeffrey B. Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
(202) 514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Lawrence Solomon Bazel
    Counsel of Record
155 Sansome Street, Seventh Floor
Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94104

ibazel@briscoelaw.net
415-402-2700
Party name: Association of California Water Agencies, et al.
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dms@pacificlegal.org
(916)-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Lawrence VanDyke
    Counsel of Record
100 North Carson Street
Carson City, NV 89701

LVanDyke@ag.nv.gov
775-684-1100
Party name: The States of Nevada, et al.