No. 17-419
Title:James Dawson, et ux., Petitioners
v.
Dale W. Steager, West Virginia State Tax Commissioner
Docketed:September 19, 2017
Linked with 17A159
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia
   Case Numbers:(16-0441)
   Decision Date:May 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2017Application (17A159) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 15, 2017 to October 13, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Aug 09 2017Application (17A159) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 9, 2017.
Aug 25 2017Application (17A159) to extend further the time from September 9, 2017 to September 25, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Aug 29 2017Application (17A159) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until September 19, 2017. No further extensions will be granted.
Sep 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2017)
Oct 05 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Brief of respondent Dale Steager, WV State Tax Comm'r in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 05 2017Reply of petitioner James Dawson filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 08 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
May 15 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
May 29 2018Supplemental brief of respondent Dale Steager, WV State Tax Commissioner filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition GRANTED limited to the question presented by the Solicitor General in his brief for the United States as amicus curiae.
Jul 17 2018Letter re Briefing Schedule of James Dawson not accepted for filing. (Corrected letter to be submitted - July 23, 2018)
Jul 24 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 27 2018Motion for an extension of time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 28, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 16, 2018.
Aug 28 2018Brief of petitioner James Dawson filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main Document
Aug 29 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, James Dawson
Blanket Consent
Aug 31 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Dale Steager, WV State Tax Commissioner
Blanket Consent
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of NARFE filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Sep 27 2018Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Monday, December 3, 2018
Oct 09 2018Motion of the Acting Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED. Justice Kavanaugh took no part in the consideration or decision of this motion.
Oct 15 2018Record requested from the Supreme Court of West Virginia.
Oct 16 2018Brief of respondent Dale Steager, WV State Tax Commissioner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 19 2018CIRCULATED
Nov 06 2018Record received from the Supreme Court of West Virginia is complete. (1 Box)
Nov 15 2018Reply of petitioner James Dawson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 03 2018Argued. For petitioners: Lawrence D. Rosenberg, Washington, D. C.; and Michael R. Huston, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Lindsay S. See, West Virginia Solicitor General, Charleston, W. Va.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence David Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

ldrosenberg@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: James Dawson
Attorneys for Respondent
Lindsay Sara See
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virginia Attorney General
1900 Kanawha Blvd E, Bldg 1 Rm 26E
Charleston, WV 25305

lindsay.s.see@wvago.gov
3045582021
Party name: Dale Steager, WV State Tax Commissioner
Other
Jeffrey Bryan Wall
    Counsel of Record
Acting Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

charlene.w.goodwin@usdoj.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Michael A. Vatis
    Counsel of Record
Steptoe & Johnson LLP
1114 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

mvatis@steptoe.com
2125063900
Party name: Narfe