No. 17-415
Title:R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, et al., Petitioners
v.
Teresa Graham, as Personal Representative of Faye Dale Graham, Deceased
Docketed:September 19, 2017
Linked with 17A74
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-14590)
   Decision Date:May 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 18 2017Application (17A74) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 16, 2017 to September 15, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jul 26 2017Application (17A74) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 15, 2017.
Sep 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2017)
Sep 22 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Sep 26 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, et al. on 09/27/2017
Sep 26 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Theresa Graham on 09/27/2017
Oct 19 2017Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Oct 19 2017Brief amicus curiae of Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc filed.
Oct 19 2017Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
202-879-5000
Party name: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Samuel Issacharoff
    Counsel of Record
40 Washington Square South
Suite 411J
New York, NY 10012

si13@nyu.edu
212-998-6580
Party name: Theresa Graham
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
(202)-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Meyers LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
212-326-2000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al.
Alan Edward Untereiner
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber, LLP
1801 K Street, N.W.
Suite 411
Washington, DC 20006

auntereiner@robbinsrussell.com
202-775-4500
Party name: Product Liability Advisory Council, Inc