No. 17-401
Title:Philip Morris USA Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
James Harris Lourie, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Barbara Ruth Lourie, Deceased
Docketed:September 15, 2017
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Second District
   Case Numbers:(2D14-5403)
   Decision Date:August 10, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:June 19, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 16, 2017)
Oct 06 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 6, 2017.
Oct 26 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 6, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

(202) 955-8500
Party name: Philip Morris USA Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Celene Harrell Humphries
    Counsel of Record
Brannock & Humphries
1111 West Cass St., Suite 200
Tampa, FL 33606

chumphries@bhappeals.com
(813) 223-4300
Party name: James Harris Lourie