No. 17-400
Title:Philip Morris USA Inc., Petitioner
v.
James Naugle, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Lucinda Naugle, Deceased
Docketed:September 15, 2017
Linked with 17A67
Lower Ct:District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fourth District
   Case Numbers:(4D16-1807)
   Decision Date:April 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 14 2017Application (17A67) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 26, 2017 to September 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jul 18 2017Application (17A67) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 24, 2017.
Sep 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 16, 2017)
Sep 16 2017Waiver of right of respondent James Naugle to respond filed.
Sep 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 06 2017Response Requested. (Due November 6, 2017)
Oct 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 21, 2017.
Nov 17 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 22, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Miguel A. Estrada
    Counsel of Record
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

(202) 955-8500
Party name: Philip Morris USA Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard B. Rosenthal
    Counsel of Record
1581 Brickell Avenue
Suite 1408
Miami, FL 33129

rbr@rosenthalappeals.com
(305)-992 6089
Party name: James Naugle