No. 17-40
Vide 17-42
Title:Coachella Valley Water District, et al., Petitioners
v.
Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians, et al.
Docketed:July 6, 2017
Linked with 16A958
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55896)
   Decision Date:March 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 07 2017Application (16A958) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2017 to July 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Apr 10 2017Application (16A958) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 5, 2017.
Jul 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2017)
Jul 24 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the Petitioner.
Jul 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017, for all respondents.
Aug 07 2017Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Aug 07 2017Brief amici curiae of Association of California Water Agencies, et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 07 2017Brief amici curiae of The States of Nevada, et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 31 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 6, 2017, for all respondents.
Oct 06 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 13, 2017, for all respondents.
Oct 13 2017Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed. VIDED.
Oct 13 2017Brief of respondent Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians in opposition filed. VIDED
Oct 31 2017Reply of petitioners Coachella Valley Water , et al. filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 02 2017Supplemental brief of respondent Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Nov 06 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Coachella Valley Water , et al. filed. (Distributed)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Walter Dellinger
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
1625 Eye Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

wdellinger@omm.com
(202) 383-5300
Party name: Coachella Valley Water , et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Adam Howard Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-922-7106
Party name: Agua Caliente Band of Cahuilla Indians
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Federal Respondents
Other
Lawrence Solomon Bazel
    Counsel of Record
Briscoe Ivester & Bazel, LLP
155 Sansome Street, Seventh Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

lbazel@briscoelaw.net
415-402-2700
Party name: Association of California Water Agencies, et al.
Damien Michael Schiff
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

dms@pacificlegal.org
(916)-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Lawrence VanDyke
    Counsel of Record
Neveda Attorney General's Office
100 North Carson Sreet
Carson City, NV 89701

LVanDyke@ag.nv.gov
775-684-1100
Party name: The States of Nevada, et al.