No. 17-387
Title:Upper Skagit Indian Tribe, Petitioner
v.
Sharline Lundgren, et vir
Docketed:September 13, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Washington
   Case Numbers:(91622-5)
   Decision Date:June 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 12, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 13, 2017)
Oct 13 2017Brief of respondents Sharline Lundgren and Ray Lundgren in opposition filed.
Oct 27 2017Reply of petitioner Upper Skagit Indian Tribe filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 17 2017Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Arthur W. Harrigan Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Danielson, Harrigan, Leyh & Tollefson, LLP
999 Third Avenue, Suite 4400
Seattle, WA 98104

arthurh@harriganleyh.com
(206) 623-1700
Party name: Upper Skagit Indian Tribe
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott Martin Ellerby
    Counsel of Record
Mullavey, Prout, Grenley & Foe, LLP
2401 NW 65th St.
Seattle, WA 98127

sellerby@ballardlawyers.com
206-789-2511
Party name: Sharline Lundgren and Ray Lundgren