No. 17-379
Title:EchoStar Satellite L.L.C., nka Dish Network L.L.C., Petitioner
v.
Florida Department of Revenue, et al.
Docketed:September 12, 2017
Linked with 17A12
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC15-1249)
   Decision Date:April 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 28 2017Application (17A12) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 12, 2017 to September 10, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jul 03 2017Application (17A12) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 10, 2017.
Sep 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2017)
Sep 29 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, EchoStar Satellite L.L.C., nka Dish Network L.L.C. and counsel for respondent Florida Department of Revenue and counsel for respondent Florida Cable Telecommunications Association have authorized the counsel for petitioner to advise the Court that the respondents give a blanket consent on 09/29/2017.
Oct 03 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017.
Oct 12 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Wine Retailers filed.
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondent Florida Department of Revenue in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212) 506-5000
Party name: EchoStar Satellite L.L.C., nka Dish Network L.L.C.
Attorneys for Respondents
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

Amit.Agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
(850) 414-3688
Party name: Florida Department of Revenue
Other
John A. Hinman
    Counsel of Record
Hinman & Carmichael, LLP
260 California Street
Suite 700
San Francisco, CA 94111

jhinman@beveragelaw.con
(415)-362-1215
Party name: National Association of Wine Retailers