No. 17-375
Title:Charlotte Kokocinski, Derivatively on Behalf of Medtronic, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Arthur D. Collins, Jr., et al.
Docketed:September 12, 2017
Linked with 17A2
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3519)
   Decision Date:March 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 20 2017Application (17A2) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 10, 2017 to August 9, 2017, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Jun 27 2017Application (17A2) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until August 9, 2017.
Jul 26 2017Application (17A2) to extend further the time from August 9, 2017 to September 8, 2017, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Aug 04 2017Application (17A2) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until September 8, 2017.
Sep 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 12, 2017)
Sep 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017, for all respondents.
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondents Arthur Collins, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Nov 29 2017Reply of petitioner Charlotte Kokocinski filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
9339 Cherry Valley Ave. SE, Suite 78
Caledonia, MI 49316

jbursch@burschlaw.com
616-450-4235
Party name: Charlotte Kokocinski
Attorneys for Respondents
Steve Gaskins
    Counsel of Record
Gaskins Bennett Birrell Schupp, LLP
333 S. Seventh Street
Suite 3000
Minnespolis, MN 55402

sgaskins@gaskinsbennett.com
612-333-9503
Party name: Arthur Collins, et al.
Linda T. CoberlyWinston & Strawn
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

(312) 558-5600
Party name: Arthur Collins, et al.