No. 17-370
Title:Jameka K. Evans, Petitioner
v.
Georgia Regional Hospital, et al.
Docketed:September 11, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15234)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2017)
Oct 05 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jameka K. Evans
Oct 10 2017Letter of October 4, 2017 from counsel for Georgia Regional Hospital, et al. received.
Oct 10 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by 76 Businesses and Organizations.
Oct 10 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Anti-Discrimination Scholars.
Oct 10 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al.
Oct 11 2017Letter of October 10, 2017 from counsel for petitioner received.
Oct 11 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 11 2017Brief amici curiae of the States of New York, et al. filed.
Oct 16 2017Response Requested. (Due November 15, 2017)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory R. Nevins
    Counsel of Record
Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.
730 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 640
Atlanta, GA 30308

gnevins@lambdalegal.org
(404) 897-1880
Party name: Jameka K. Evans
Attorneys for Respondents
Sarah Hawkins Warren
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Georgia
40 Capitol Square SW
Atlanta, GA 30334

404-463-0770
Party name: Georgia Regional Hospital, et al.
Other
Todd Steven Anten
    Counsel of Record
Quinn, Emanuel, Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Fl.
New York, NY 10010

toddanten@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: 76 Businesses and Organizations
Thomas Payne Schmidt
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells, US, LLP
875 Third Ave.
New York, NY 10022

thomas.schmidt@hoganlovells.com
212 -918 -3000
Party name: Anti-Discrimination Scholars
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212)-937-7294
Party name: GLBTQ Legal Advocates & Defenders, et al.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
120 Broadway, 25th Floor
New York, NY 10271-0332

barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
(212) 416-8020
Party name: the States of New York, et al.