No. 17-368
Title:Salt River Project Agricultural Improvement and Power District, Petitioner
v.
SolarCity Corporation
Docketed:September 11, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-17302)
   Decision Date:June 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2017)
Oct 11 2017Brief of respondent SolarCity Corporation in opposition filed.
Oct 11 2017Brief amici curiae of American Public Power Association, et al. filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel Stephen Volchok
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006

(202)-663-6103
Party name: Salt River Project Agricultural District
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard A. Feinstein
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner, LLP
1401 New York Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

rfeinstein@bsflp.com
202-237-6131
Party name: SolarCity Corporation
Other
John Michael Baker
    Counsel of Record
Greene Espel, PLLP
222 South Ninth Street
Suite 2200
Minneapolis, MN 55402

jbaker@greeneespe.com
(612) 373-0830
Party name: American Public Power Association, et al.