No. 17-365 | |
Title: | Kindred Hospitals East, LLC, dba Kindred Hospital Ocala, Petitioner v. Estate of Marianne Klemish, et al. |
Docketed: | September 11, 2017 |
Linked with 17A116 | |
Lower Ct: | District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fifth District |
Case Numbers: | (5D15-2574) |
Decision Date: | July 15, 2016 |
Discretionary Court Decision Date: | May 5, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 24 2017 | Application (17A116) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 3, 2017 to September 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jul 27 2017 | Application (17A116) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 1, 2017. |
Sep 01 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 11, 2017) |
Sep 12 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017. |
Oct 11 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States filed. |
Nov 13 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2017. |
Nov 27 2017 | Brief of respondents Estate of Marianne Klemish and Frank Klemish in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther | |
Dec 13 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. |
Dec 13 2017 | Reply of petitioner Kindred Hospitals East, LLC filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Andrew John Pincus Counsel of Record | 1999 K Street, NW Washington, DC 20006 | (202) 263-3000 |
Party name: Kindred Hospitals East, LLC | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Bryan S. Gowdy Counsel of Record | Creed & Gowdy, P.A. 865 May Street Jacksonville, FL 32204 bgowdy@appellate-firm.com | 9043500075 |
Party name: Estate of Marianne Klemish and Frank Klemish | ||
Jessie L. Harrell Counsel of Record | Creed & Gowdy 865 May Street Jacksonville, FL 32204 jharrell@appellate-firm.com | (904)-350-0075 |
Party name: Estate of Marianne Klemish, et al. | ||
Other | ||
Thomas Ryan McCarthy Counsel of Record | Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC 3033 Wilson Boulevard Suite 700 Arlington, VA 22201 tom@consovoymccarthy.com | 703-243-9423 |
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States |