No. 17-346
Title:Saul C. Touchet, Petitioner
v.
Estis Well Service, L.L.C., et al.
Docketed:September 7, 2017
Linked with 17A7
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-30481)
   Decision Date:April 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 27 2017Application (17A7) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 9, 2017 to September 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito.
Jul 05 2017Application (17A7) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 5, 2017.
Sep 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2017)
Sep 27 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Virgie Ann Romero McBride on 10/06/2017
Sep 27 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Saul C. Touchet
Oct 10 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Seafarers' Rights International.
Oct 10 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Global Maritime Ministries, Inc. New Orleans.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg Hansen, PLLC
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3215

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
(202)-326-7951
Party name: Saul C. Touchet
Attorneys for Respondents
Brian Christopher Colomb
    Counsel of Record
Gordon McKernan Injury Attorneys
1819 Pinhook,
Suite 250
Lafayette, LA 70508

337-999-9999
Party name: Virgie Ann Romero McBride
Other
Erin Glenn Busby
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

ebusby@law.utexas.edu
713-966-0409
Party name: Seafarers' Rights International
Kenneth H. Hooks II
    Counsel of Record
Dodson & Hooks, LLC
112 Founders Drive
Baton Rouge, LA 70810

kenny@dodsonhooks.com
225-756-0222
Party name: Global Maritime Ministries, Inc. New Orleans