No. 17-343
Title:Convergex Group, L.L.C., et al., Petitioners
v.
Landol Fletcher
Docketed:September 6, 2017
Linked with 16A1263
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-734)
   Decision Date:February 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 4, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 23 2017Application (16A1263) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 3, 2017 to September 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jun 26 2017Application (16A1263) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until September 1, 2017.
Sep 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 6, 2017)
Sep 08 2017Waiver of right of respondent Landol Fletcher to respond filed.
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 26 2017Response Requested. (Due October 26, 2017)
Sep 29 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 27, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius
1717 Main Street, Suite 3200
Dallas, TX 75201-7347

allyson.ho@morganlewis.com
214-466-4180
Party name: Convergex Group LLC, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Peter K. Stris
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher LLP
725 S. Figueroa St., Ste. 1830
Los Angeles, CA 90017

peter.stris@strismaher.com
(213) 995-6801
Party name: Landol Fletcher