No. 17-342
Title:Jeff Silvester, et al., Petitioners
v.
Xavier Becerra, Attorney General of California
Docketed:September 6, 2017
Linked with 16A1234
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-16840)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2017Application (16A1234) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 3, 2017 to September 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jun 19 2017Application (16A1234) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 1, 2017.
Sep 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 6, 2017)
Sep 15 2017Waiver of right of respondent Xavier Becerra to respond filed.
Sep 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Sep 29 2017Response Requested. (Due October 30, 2017)
Oct 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Crime Prevention Research Center filed.
Oct 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 1, 2017.
Oct 26 2017Brief amici curiae of Firearms Policy Foundation, et al. filed.
Oct 26 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Dec 01 2017Brief of respondent Xavier Becerra in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Erik S. Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Erik S. Jaffe, P.C.
5101 34th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20008

jaffe@esjpc.com
(202) 237-8265
Party name: Jeff Silvester, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jonathan Michael Eisenberg
    Counsel of Record
California Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney
300 South Spring, Suite 1702
Los Angeles, CA 90013

jonathan.eisenberg@doj.ca.gov
(213)269-6246
Party name: Xavier Becerra
Other
Douglas A. Applegate
    Counsel of Record
Seiler, Epstein, Ziegler & Applegate, LLP
601 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000
San Francisco, CA 94111

daa@sezalaw.com
415-979-0500
Party name: Crime Prevention Research Center
Raymond Mark DiGuiseppe
    Counsel of Record
2 N. Front Street, Fifth Floor
Wilmington, NC 28401

law.rmd@gmail.com
(910) 713-8804
Party name: Firearms Policy Foundation, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute, 1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202)-842-0200
Party name: Cato Institute