No. 17-340
Title:New Prime Inc., Petitioner
v.
Dominic Oliveira
Docketed:September 6, 2017
Linked with 18A99
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2364)
   Decision Date:May 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 6, 2017)
Sep 21 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 6, 2017.
Oct 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed.
Oct 06 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Oct 27 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Brief of respondent Dominic Oliveira in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 01 2017Reply of petitioner New Prime Inc. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 04 2018Rescheduled.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018Petition GRANTED.
Mar 06 2018Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Mar 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file (the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits) granted and the time is extended to and including May 14, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 11, 2018.
May 14 2018Brief of petitioner New Prime Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 14 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of cost filed).
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of New England Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Trucking Associations, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of Customized Logistics and Delivery Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Motion for a further extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jun 20 2018Motion for a further extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted, and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2018.
Jul 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT On Wednesday, October 3, 2018
Jul 18 2018Brief of respondent Dominic Oliveira filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Motion of New Prime, Inc. for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (July 24, 2018)
Jul 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Association for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Jul 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Historians filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Massachusetts, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Employment Law Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Brief amici curiae of International Brotherhood of Teamsters, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Statutory Construction Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Application (18A99) to extend the time to file a reply brief on the merits from August 17, 2018 to August 24, 2018, submitted to Justice Breyer.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jul 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Steve Viscelli, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 30 2018Application (18A99) granted by Justice Breyer extending the time to file petitioner's reply brief on the merits to and including August 24, 2018.
Aug 03 2018CIRCULATED
Aug 07 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit.
Aug 08 2018Record for the U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit is electronic and located on PACER.
Aug 14 2018Record received from U.S.C.A. 1st Circuit. 1 envelope.
Aug 22 2018Reply of petitioner New Prime, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 03 2018Argued. For petitioner: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr., Los Angeles, Cal. For respondent: Jennifer D. Bennett, Oakland, Cal.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Theodore J. Boutrous
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90071

tboutrous@gibsondunn.com
213-229-7000
Party name: New Prime Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer D. Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Public Justice
475 14th Street, Suite 610
Oakland, CA 94612

jbennett@publicjustice.net
(510) 622-8150
Party name: Dominic Oliveira
Other
Richard Pianka
    Counsel of Record
ATA Litigation Center
950 North Glebe Road, Suite 210
Arlington, VA 22203

rpianka@trucking.org
(703)-838-1889
Party name: American Trucking Associations, Inc.
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Gerson H. Smoger
    Counsel of Record
Smoger and Associates
13250 Branch View Ln.
Dallas, TX 75234

gerson@texasinjurylaw.com
9722435297
Party name: American Association for Justice
Paul Damien Cullen Jr.
    Counsel of Record
The Cullen Law Firm, PLLC
1101 30th Street NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20007

pxc@cullenlaw.com
2029448600
Party name: Owner-Operator Independent Drivers Association, Inc.
D. Michael Dale
    Counsel of Record
Northwest Workers' Justice Project
812 S.W. Washington
Suite 225
Portland, OR 97205-0000

michael@nwjp.org
5035258454
Party name: STEVE VISCELLI, DOMINGO AVALOS, GABRIEL PROCEL, BRION GRAY, JAMES ZUBER, HECTOR ZELAYA, DESIREE ANN WOOD, THE WAGE JUSTICE CENTER AND REAL WOMEN IN TRUCKING, INC.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Andrew Michael Grossman
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, N.W.
Suite 1100
Washington, DC 20036

agrossman@bakerlaw.com
2028611697
Party name: Cato Institute
Robert G. Hulteng
    Counsel of Record
Littler, Mendelson, P.C.
333 Bush Street
34th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

rhulteng@littler.com
415-433-1940
Party name: Customized Logistics and Delivery Association
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Sachin Sharadkumar Pandya
    Counsel of Record
University of Connecticut School of Law
65 Elizabeth Street
Hartford, CT 06105

sachin.pandya@uconn.edu
8605705169
Party name: Historians
Anna Purna Prakash
    Counsel of Record
Nichols Kaster, PLLP
4600 IDS Center, 80 South 8th Street
Minneapolis, MN 55402

aprakash@nka.com
6122563200
Party name: Employment Law Scholars
Benjamin G. Robbins
    Counsel of Record
New England Legal Foundation
150 Lincoln Street
Boston, MA 02111-2504

benrobbins@nelfonline.org
8577727620
Party name: New England Legal Foundation
Peter Romer-Friedman
    Counsel of Record
Outten & Golden LLP
601 Massachusetts Avenue NW, 2nd Floor West Suite
Washington, DC 20001

prf@outtengolden.com
202-847-4402
Party name: Statutory Construction Scholars as Amicus Curiae
Catherine Kiley Ruckelshaus
    Counsel of Record
Nat'l Employment Law Project
75 Maiden Lane, Suite 601
New York, NY 10038

cruckelshaus@nelp.org
6466938221
Party name: Teamsters Int'l Union, National Employment Law Project, Economic Policy Institute, National Employment Lawyers Assn
Sheldon Whitehouse
    Counsel of Record
Hart Senate Office Bldg., Rm. 530
Washington, DC 20510

counsel@whitehouse.senate.gov
(202) 224-2921
Party name: Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse
Karla Enid Zarbo
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Attorney General of Massachusetts
1 Ashburton Place, 18th Floor
Boston, MA 02108

Karla.Zarbo@MassMail.State.MA.US
617-727-2200
Party name: Massachusetts, et al.