No. 17-333
Title:O. John Benisek, et al., Appellants
v.
Linda H. Lamone, Administrator, Maryland State Board of Elections, et al.
Docketed:September 1, 2017
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the District of Maryland
   Case Numbers:(1:13-cv-03233-JKB)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 01 2017Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due October 2, 2017)
Sep 01 2017Motion to expedite consideration of the jurisdictional statement filed by appellants.
Sep 11 2017Response in opposition to motion to expedite consideration of the jurisdictional statement from appellees filed.
Sep 12 2017Reply to response in opposition to motion to expedite consideration of the jurisdictional statement from appellants filed.
Sep 13 2017Motion to expedite consideration filed by appellants DENIED.
Sep 14 2017Order extending time to file response to the jurisdictional statement to and including October 31, 2017.
Oct 31 2017Motion to affirm filed by appellees Linda H. Lamone, et al.
Nov 13 2017Opposition to motion of appellants O. John Benisek, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 08 2017Further consideration of the question of jurisdiction is POSTPONED to the hearing of the case on the merits.
Dec 26 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, O. John Benisek, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Linda H. Lamone, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 22 2018Brief of appellants O. John Benisek, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Joint appendix filed (4 volumes). (Statement of cost filed.)
Main DocumentOtherOtherOtherProof of Service
Jan 24 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT ON Wednesday, March 28, 2018
Jan 25 2018Brief amicus curiae of Common Cause filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Bipartisan Current and Former Members of Congress filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, and the County of Santa Clara filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor Michael Kang filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Campaign Legal Center and Southern Coalition for Social Justice in Support of Neither Party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Brennan Center for Justice at N.Y.U. School of Law filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of National Association for the Advancement of Colored People, et al. in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Governors Lawrence Joseph Hogan Jr., Arnold A. Schwarzenegger, Joseph Graham "Gray" Davis Jr., and John R. Kasich filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2018Brief amicus curiae of Stephen M. Shapiro filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018CIRCULATED
Feb 21 2018Record requested from the U.S.D.C Dist. of Maryland.
Feb 21 2018Brief of appellees Linda H. Lamone, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Senator Joseph B. Scarnati, III filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of State of Wisconsin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of Freedom Partners Chamber of Commerce filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 28 2018Brief amicus curiae of States of Michigan, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2018Reply of appellants O. John Benisek, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018Argued. For appellants: Michael B. Kimberly, Washington, D. C. For appellees: Steven M. Sullivan, Solicitor General, Baltimore, Md.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: O. John Benisek, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Steven Marshall Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 St. Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202

ssullivan@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-6325
Party name: Linda H. Lamone, et al.
Other
Emmet J Bondurant II
    Counsel of Record
Bondurant, Mixson & Elmore, LLP
3900 One Atlantic Center
1201 W. Peachtree Street
Atlanta, GA 30309

bondurant@bmelaw.com
404-421-0837
Party name: Common Cause
Douglas R. Cox
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

dcox@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3531
Party name: Freedom Partners Chamber of Commerce
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Bipartisan Current and Former Members of Congress
Daniel F Kolb
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

daniel.kolb@davispolk.com
212-450-4000
Party name: Professor Michael Kang
Theresa Jeane Lee
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, Inc.
125 Broad Street, 18th Floor
New York, NY 10004

tlee@aclu.org
2122847359
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union
Vincent Gregory Levy
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10019

vlevy@hsgllp.com
(646) 837-5132
Party name: THE BRENNAN CENTER FOR JUSTICE AT N.Y.U. SCHOOL OF LAW
Aaron David Lindstrom
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
525 West Ottawa Street, 7th Floor
Lansing, MI 48909

lindstroma@michigan.gov
517-373-1124
Party name: States of Michigan, et al.
Alan B. Morrison
    Counsel of Record
George Washington Law School
2000 H Street NW
Washington, DC 20052

abmorrison@law.gwu.edu
2029947120
Party name: Stephen M. Shapiro
Gary Michael Parsons Jr.
    Counsel of Record
1333 New Hampshire Ave NW
Washington, DC 20036

michael@parsons.net
2028874559
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, National League of Cities, U.S. Conference of Mayors, International City/County Management Association, and the County of Santa Clara
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rpopper@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
Ezra David Rosenberg
    Counsel of Record
Lawyer's Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
1401 New York Ave., N.W.
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20005

erosenberg@lawyerscommittee.org
(202) 662-8600
Party name: The Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Lavelle Lemon, Marlon Reid, Celeste Sims, Patricia Smith, and Coley Tyson
Paul March Smith
    Counsel of Record
Campaign Legal Center
1411 K Street, NW, Suite 1400
Washington, DC 20005

psmith@campaignlegalcenter.org
202-736-2200
Party name: The Campaign Legal Center, The Southern Coalition for Social Justice
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Senator Joseph B. Scarnati, III
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Dept. of Justice
17 W. Main Street
P.O. Box 7857
Madison, WI 53707-7857

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: State of Wisconsin
Colin Emmet Wrabley
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith LLP
225 Fifth Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

cwrabley@reedsmith.com
412-288-3548
Party name: Governors Lawrence Joseph Hogan Jr., Arnold A. Schwarzenegger, Joseph Graham "Gray" Davis Jr., and John R. Kasich