No. 17-326 | |
Title: | Raheem Chabezz Johnson, Petitioner v. Virginia |
Docketed: | August 31, 2017 |
Linked with 16A1216 | |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Virginia |
Case Numbers: | (141623) |
Decision Date: | December 15, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 24, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jun 12 2017 | Application (16A1216) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 22, 2017 to August 21, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jun 16 2017 | Application (16A1216) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until August 21, 2017. |
Aug 21 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2017) |
Sep 05 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Virginia to respond filed. |
Sep 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. |
Sep 26 2017 | Response Requested. (Due October 26, 2017) |
Oct 06 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 21, 2017. |
Nov 20 2017 | Brief of respondent Virginia in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count | |
Dec 05 2017 | Reply of petitioner Raheem Johnson filed. (Distributed) |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. |
Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Ashley C. Parrish Counsel of Record | King & Spalding LLP 1700 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Suite 200 Washington, DC 20006 aparrish@kslaw.com | (202) 626-2627 |
Party name: Raheem Johnson | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Matthew Robert McGuire Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General 202 North Ninth Street Richmond, VA 23219 mmcguire@oag.state.va.us | 8047867773 |
Party name: Virginia |