No. 17-321
Title:James Robert Christensen, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:August 31, 2017
Linked with 16A1249
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Tennessee, Western Division
   Case Numbers:(W2014-00931-SC-R11-CD)
   Decision Date:April 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 16 2017Application (16A1249) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 6, 2017 to September 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jun 21 2017Application (16A1249) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 4, 2017.
Aug 28 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2017)
Sep 22 2017Waiver of right of respondent Tennessee to respond filed.
Oct 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 10 2017Response Requested. (Due November 9, 2017)
Oct 25 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2017.
Dec 11 2017Brief of Tennessee in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Claiborne Hambrick Ferguson
    Counsel of Record
294 Washington Avenue
Memphis, TN 38103

(901) 529-6400
Party name: James Christensen
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Keeton Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Special Asst. to the Solicitor General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov
(615) 532-6026
Party name: Tennessee