No. 17-320
Title:Perfect 10, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Giganews, Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 31, 2017
Linked with 17A53
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-55500, 15-55523, 15-56026)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 2, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 06 2017Application (17A53) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 31, 2017 to August 30, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jul 14 2017Application (17A53) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 30, 2017.
Aug 30 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2017)
Aug 31 2017Waiver of right of respondents Giganews, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Sep 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 20 2017Response Requested. (Due October 20, 2017)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lawrence Saul Robbins
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sa
1801 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

lrobbins@robbinsrussell.com
(202) 775-4500
Party name: Perfect 10
Attorneys for Respondents
Andrew Phillip Bridges
    Counsel of Record
Fenwick & West, LLP
555 California Street
12th floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

abridges@fenwick.com
415-875-2389
Party name: Giganews, Inc., et al.