No. 17-313
Title:Salomon Ledezma-Cosino, aka Cocino Soloman Ledesma, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:August 30, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-73289)
   Decision Date:May 30, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 29, 2017)
Sep 26 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 30, 2017.
Oct 24 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 29, 2017.
Nov 29 2017Brief of respondent Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 12 2017Reply of Salomon Ledezma-Cosino submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kcorkran@orrick.com
(202) 339-8400
Party name: Salomon Ledezma-Cosino
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General