No. 17-312
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Rene Sanchez-Gomez, et al.
Docketed:August 29, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-50561, 13-50562, 13-50566, 13-50571)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 29 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 28, 2017)
Sep 19 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017, for all respondents.
Sep 28 2017Brief amici curiae of Senator Jeff Flake, et al. filed.
Sep 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of California State Sheriffs' Association filed.
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondents Moises Patricio-Guzman, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Nov 13 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondents Moises Patricio-Guzman, et al.
Main Document
Nov 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Nov 21 2017Reply of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 08 2017Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondents GRANTED.
Dec 08 2017Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondents
Reuben Camper Cahn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defenders of San Diego, Inc.
225 Broadway
Suite 900
San Diego, CA 92101

Reuben_Cahn@fd.org
(619)-234-8467
Party name: Moises Patricio-Guzman, et al.
Other
Michael A. Fragoso
    Counsel of Record
Office of Senator Jeff Flake
413 Russell Senate Office Building
Washington, DC 20510

michael_fragoso@flake.senate.gov
202-224
Party name: Senator Jeff Flake, et al.
James R. Touchstone
    Counsel of Record
Jones & Mayer
3777 North Harbor Boulevard
Fullerton, CA 92835

jrt@jones-mayer.com
(714)-446-1400
Party name: California State Sheriffs' Association