No. 17-302
Title:Rony Estuardo Perez-Guzman, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:August 28, 2017
Linked with 17A35
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-70579)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:April 26, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 30 2017Application (17A35) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 25, 2017 to August 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jul 07 2017Application (17A35) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 24, 2017.
Aug 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 27, 2017)
Sep 19 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Rony E. Perez-Guzman on 09/19/2017
Sep 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Administrative Law and Statutory Interpretation Scholars filed.
Sep 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of American Immigration Lawyers Association filed.
Sep 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Sep 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Scholars of Immigration and International Law filed.
Oct 02 2017Waiver of right of respondent Sessions, Att'y. Gen. to respond filed.
Oct 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 11 2017Response Requested. (Due November 13, 2017)
Nov 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Eric Michael Fraser
    Counsel of Record
2929 North Central Avenue
Suite 2100
Phoenix, AZ 85012

efraser@omlaw.com
602-640-9000
Party name: Rony E. Perez-Guzman
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Sessions, Att'y. Gen.
Other
Linda T. Coberly
    Counsel of Record
Winston & Strawn, LLP
35 West Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60601

lcoberly@winston.com
(312)-558-5600
Party name: Administrative Law and Statutory Interpretation Scholars
Daniel Edward Jones
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

djones@mayerbrown.com
202 263-3000
Party name: Scholars of Immigration and International Law
Paul Alessio Mezzina
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding, LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20006

pmezzina@kslaw.com
(202)-737-0500
Party name: Cato Institute
Christopher M. Swift
    Counsel of Record
Foley & Lardner, LLP
3000 K Street, LLP
Washington, DC 20007

cswift@foley.com
202-205-4103
Party name: American Immigration Lawyers Association