No. 17-301
Title:Kenosha Unified School District No. 1 Board of Education, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ashton Whitaker, By His Mother and Next Friend, Melissa Whitaker
Docketed:August 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3522)
   Decision Date:May 30, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 25 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 27, 2017)
Aug 28 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Kenosha Unified School District No. 1 Board of Education, et al. on 09/13/2017
Sep 14 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 27, 2017.
Sep 26 2017Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Sep 26 2017Brief amici curiae of Michigan Association of Christian Schools, et al. filed.
Sep 26 2017Brief amici curiae of Family Research Council, et al. filed.
Sep 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of Alliance Defending Freedom filed.
Sep 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed.
Sep 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of Concerned Women for America filed.
Sep 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of William J. Bennett filed.
Sep 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Public Advocate of the United States, et al. filed.
Sep 27 2017Brief amici curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al. filed.
Oct 16 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 27, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 27, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ronald S. Stadler
    Counsel of Record
Mallery & Zimmerman, S.C.
731 North Jackson Street, Suite 900
Milwaukee, WI 53202-4697

rstadler@mzmilw.com
(414) 271-2424
Party name: Kenosha Unified School District No. 1 Board of Education, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sasha Minh Samberg-Champion
    Counsel of Record
Relman, Dane & Colfax
1225 19th St., NW
Suite 600
Washington, DC 20036-2456

202-728-0848
Party name: Ashton Whitaker
Other
Matthew James Clark
    Counsel of Record
Foundation For Moral Law
One Dexter Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

matt@morallaw.org
334-262-1245
Party name: Foundation for Moral Law
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: William J. Bennett
Deborah Dewart
    Counsel of Record
620 E. Sabiston Drive
Swansboro, NC 28584-9674

debcpalaw@earthlink.net
(910)-326-4554
Party name: Family Research Council, et al.
John C. Eastman
    Counsel of Record
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, et al.
Steven Werner Fitschen
    Counsel of Record
National Legal Foundation
2224 Virginia Beach Blvd., Suite 204
Virginia Beach, VA 23454

nlf@nlf.net
(757)-463-6133
Party name: Concerned Women for America
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
1250 Connecticut Avenue
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

lj@larryjoseph.com
202-355-9452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Gary Stuart McCaleb
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

gmccaleb@adflegal.org
(480)-444-0020
Party name: Alliance Defending Freedom
Erin Elizabeth Mersino
    Counsel of Record
Great Lakes Justice Center
5600 W. Mount Hope Hwy.
Lansing, MI 48917

contact@greatlakesjc.org
517-322-3207
Party name: Michigan Association of Christian Schools, et al.
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Public Advocate of the United States, et al.