No. 17-294
Title:Karen Thompson, Petitioner
v.
Kelly Soo Park
Docketed:August 24, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-56655)
   Decision Date:March 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 24, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2017)
Sep 05 2017Waiver of right of respondent Kelly S. Park to respond filed.
Sep 05 2017Waiver of right of respondent Kelly S. Park to respond filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 07 2017Response Requested. (Due October 10, 2017)
Oct 05 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 9, 2017.
Oct 10 2017Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster, LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

JPalmore@mofo.com
(202) 887-1500
Party name: Karen Thompson
Attorneys for Respondent
Becky S. James
    Counsel of Record
James & Associates
23564 Calabasas Road, Suite 201
Calabasas, CA 91302

bjames@jamesaa.com
(310) 492-5104
Party name: Kelly S. Park
Other
Timothy Towery Coates
    Counsel of Record
Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland, LLP
5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90036

tcoates@gmsr.com
310-859-7811
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al.