No. 17-291 *** CAPITAL CASE *** | |
Title: | Bruce Westbrooks, Warden, Petitioner v. Andrew Lee Thomas, Jr. |
Docketed: | August 24, 2017 |
Linked with 17A50 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-5399) |
Decision Date: | February 24, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 19, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jul 06 2017 | Application (17A50) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 18, 2017 to August 17, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Jul 10 2017 | Application (17A50) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 17, 2017. |
Aug 17 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2017) |
Sep 14 2017 | Brief of respondent Andrew Lee Thomas, Jr. in opposition filed. |
Sep 14 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Andrew Lee Thomas, Jr. |
Oct 04 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. |
Oct 30 2017 | Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jennifer L. Smith Counsel of Record | Office of the Attorney General Associate Solicitor General P.O. Box 20207 Nashville, TN 37202-0207 Jennifer.smith@ag.tn.gov | 615-741-3487 |
Party name: Bruce Westbrooks, Warden | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Robert Louis Hutton Counsel of Record | 6000 Poplar Avenue Suite 400 Memphis, TN 38119 rhutton@glankler.com | 901-525-1322 |
Party name: Andrew Lee Thomas, Jr. |