No. 17-278
Title:Vien-Phuong Thi Ho, Petitioner
v.
ReconTrust Company, N.A., et al.
Docketed:August 22, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(10-56884)
   Decision Date:October 19, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:May 22, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 21, 2017)
Sep 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 23, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Daniel L. Geyser
    Counsel of Record
Stris & Maher, LLP
Three Energy Square
6688 N. Central Expy., Suite 1650
Dallas, TX 75206

daniel.geyser@strismaher.com
214-396-6634
Party name: Vien-Phuong Ho
Attorneys for Respondents
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005-5901

kshanmugam@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: ReconTrust Company, et al.