No. 17-270
Title:Jimmie Eugene White, II, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 21, 2017
Linked with 16A1205
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1009)
   Decision Date:February 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 20, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 07 2017Application (16A1205) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 18, 2017 to August 17, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jun 07 2017Application (16A1205) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until August 17, 2017.
Aug 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 20, 2017)
Sep 15 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 20, 2017.
Oct 13 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2017.
Nov 30 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy C. Marwell
    Counsel of Record
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 500 West
Washington, DC 20037-1701

jmarwell@velaw.com
(202) 639-6500
Party name: Jimmie Eugene White, II
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States