No. 17-251 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Abel Daniel Hidalgo, Petitioner
v.
Arizona
Docketed:August 16, 2017
Linked with 16A1185
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CR-15-0049-AP)
   Decision Date:March 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 30 2017Application (16A1185) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 13, 2017 to July 14, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jun 06 2017Application (16A1185) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 14, 2017.
Jun 28 2017Application (16A1185) to extend further the time from July 14, 2017 to August 12, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jun 29 2017Application (16A1185) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 12, 2017.
Aug 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 15, 2017)
Sep 08 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 16, 2017.
Sep 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Amnesty International filed.
Sep 15 2017Brief amici curiae of Former and Current Arizona Judges, Prosecutors, Defenders, Legislators and Others filed.
Sep 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Fair Punishment Project filed.
Sep 15 2017Brief amici curiae of The Promise of Justice Initiative, et al. filed.
Oct 16 2017Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed.
Oct 31 2017Reply of petitioner Abel Hidalgo filed.
Nov 01 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.
Nov 13 2017Rescheduled.
Nov 27 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Dec 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/8/2017.
Dec 06 2017Record Requested.
Dec 11 2017Record received from Supreme Court of Arizona. (One envelope with sealed materials; the remainder of the record is electronic.)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
(202) 637-5600
Party name: Abel Hidalgo
Attorneys for Respondent
Dominic Emil Draye
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1275 W. Washington St.
Phoenix, AZ 85007

solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
602-542-3333
Party name: Arizona
Other
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Avenue
Washington, DC 20001

bburgess@goodwinlaw.com
202-346-4000
Party name: Amnesty International
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
636 Baronne Street
New Orleans, LA 70115

benc@thejusticecenter.org
504-529-5955
Party name: The Promise of Justice Initiative, et al.
Gregory Jacob Dubinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holwell Shuster & Goldberg, LLP
750 Seventh Avenue, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10019

gdubinsky@hsgllp.com
646-837-5151
Party name: Former and Current Arizona Judges, Prosecutors, Defenders, Legislators and Others
Joshua Alexander Geltzer
    Counsel of Record
Georgetown University Law Center
600 New Jersey Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

jg1861@georgetown.edu
202 661 6728
Party name: Fair Punishment Project