No. 17-250
Title:Mitchell J. Stein, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 16, 2017
Linked with 16A1129
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-15621)
   Decision Date:January 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 16, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 18 2017Application (16A1129) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 14, 2017 to July 14, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
May 25 2017Application (16A1129) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 14, 2017.
Jun 30 2017Application (16A1129) to extend further the time from July 14, 2017 to August 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jul 06 2017Application (16A1129) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 13, 2017.
Aug 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 15, 2017)
Sep 07 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 16, 2017.
Sep 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center on the Administration of Criminal Law filed.
Sep 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association for Public Defense filed.
Oct 16 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 6, 2017.
Nov 06 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
202-879-5000
Party name: Mitchell J. Stein
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Brendan Jeremiah Crimmins
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

bcrimmins@kellogghansen.com
(202) 326-7900
Party name: Center on the Administration of Criminal Law
Timothy Patrick O'Toole
    Counsel of Record
Miller & Chevalier Chartered
900 Sixteenth St., NW
Washington, DC 20006

totoole@milchev.com
(202) 626-5800
Party name: National Association for Public Defense