No. 17-241
Title:Wilfredo Garay Reyes, Petitioner
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General
Docketed:August 15, 2017
Linked with 16A1257
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-70686)
   Decision Date:November 30, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 29, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 16 2017Application (16A1257) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 27, 2017 to August 11, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jun 26 2017Application (16A1257) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until August 11, 2017.
Aug 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2017)
Sep 14 2017Waiver of right of respondent Sessions, Jefferson B. to respond filed.
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Sep 26 2017Response Requested. (Due October 26, 2017)
Oct 18 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 27, 2017.
Nov 13 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 7, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lori Alvino McGill
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh + Eskovitz LLP
2001 M Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20036

lalvinomegill@wilkinsonwalsh.com
(202) 847-4035
Party name: Wilfredo Garay Reyes
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Sessions, Jefferson B.