No. 17-236
Title:Sarah Marie Johnson, Petitioner
v.
Idaho
Docketed:August 15, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Idaho
   Case Numbers:(42857)
   Decision Date:May 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 14, 2017)
Aug 24 2017Waiver of right of respondent Idaho to respond filed.
Sep 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Sep 07 2017Rescheduled.
Sep 11 2017Brief amicus curiae of Fair Punishment Project filed.
Sep 12 2017Brief amici curiae of Juvenile Law Center and the Children and Family Justice Center filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John R. Mills
    Counsel of Record
Phillips Black Project
836 Harrison Street
San Francisco, CA 94107

j.mills@phillipsblack.org
(888) 532-0897
Party name: Sarah Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Jessica Marie Lorello
    Counsel of Record
Idaho Attorney General's Office
P.O. Box 83720, 700 W. Jefferson Statehouse, 4th Floor
Boise, ID 83720

jessica.lorello@ag.idaho.gov
(208)-332-3544
Party name: Idaho
Other
David Henry Bamberger
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper, LLP (US)
500 Eight Street, NW
Washington, DC 20004

david.bamberger@dlpiper.com
202-799-4500
Party name: Fair Punishment Project
Marsha Levick
    Counsel of Record
Juvenile Law Center
1315 Walnut Street, 4th Fl.
Philadelphia, PA 19107

mlevick@jlc.org
215-625-0551
Party name: Juvenile Law Center and the Children and Family Justice Center