No. 17-230 | |
Title: | James R. Alguire, et al., Petitioners v. Ralph S. Janvey |
Docketed: | August 11, 2017 |
Linked with 16A1138 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (14-10857, 14-10945, 14-11014, 14-11093) |
Decision Date: | January 31, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 8, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
May 18 2017 | Application (16A1138) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 6, 2017 to August 5, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
May 24 2017 | Application (16A1138) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until August 5, 2017. |
Aug 04 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 11, 2017) |
Aug 28 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Ralph S. Janvey to respond filed. |
Sep 13 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. |
Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Bradley W. Foster Counsel of Record | Andrews Kurth Kenyon LLP 1717 Main Street, Suite 3700 Dallas, TX 75201 bradfoster@andrewskurth.com | (214) 659-4646 |
Party name: James R. Alguire, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Kevin Marshall Sadler Counsel of Record | Baker Botts, LLP 1001 Page Mill Road Building 1, Suite 200 Palo Alto, CA 94304 kevin.sadler@bakerbotts.com | (650) 739-7500 |
Party name: Ralph S. Janvey |