No. 17-228
Title:The Renco Group, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Lee E. Buchwald, as Trustee for Magnesium Corporation of America and Related Debtor, Renco Metals, Inc., et al.
Docketed:August 11, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2691-bk, 15-2962-bk, 15-2971-bk)
   Decision Date:March 8, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:May 11, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 11, 2017)
Sep 06 2017Brief of respondent Lee E. Buchwald in opposition filed.
Sep 19 2017Reply of petitioners Renco Group, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Sep 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212) 506-5000
Party name: Renco Group, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Michael K. Kellogg
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

mkellogg@kellogghansen.com
(202) 326-7900
Party name: Lee E. Buchwald