No. 17-225
Title:Garco Construction, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Robert M. Speer, Acting Secretary of the Army
Docketed:August 10, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2016-1936)
   Decision Date:May 9, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 11, 2017)
Sep 07 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 11, 2017.
Sep 08 2017Brief amici curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Sep 11 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Sep 11 2017Brief amici curiae of the States of Utah, et al. filed.
Sep 11 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Oct 11 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 1, 2017.
Dec 01 2017Brief of respondent Robert M. Speer, Acting Secretary of the Army in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Dec 19 2017Reply of petitioner GARCO Construction, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 03 2018Rescheduled.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: GARCO Construction, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Robert Speer, Acting Secretary of the Army
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman Univ.
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Tyler Green
    Counsel of Record
Utah Solicitor General
350 N. State Street, Suite 230
Salt Lake City, UT 84114-2320

tylergreen@agutah.gov
(801-538-9600
Party name: the States of Utah, et al.
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
South Legal Foundation
2255 Sewell Mill Road, Suite 320
Marietta, GA 30062

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation, et al.
Mark W. Mosier
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling, LLP
One CityCenter, 850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

mmosier@cov.com
(202)-662-6000
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America