No. 17-22
Title:Floyd G. Elmore, Petitioner
v.
Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Docketed:June 30, 2017
Linked with 16A1126
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1280)
   Decision Date:December 23, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:March 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 18 2017Application (16A1126) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 1, 2017 to July 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito.
May 19 2017Application (16A1126) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until July 3, 2017.
Jun 30 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 31, 2017)
Jul 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 30, 2017.
Aug 30 2017Brief of respondent Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. in opposition filed.
Sep 12 2017Reply of petitioner Floyd G. Elmore filed.
Sep 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin, LLP
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
(202) 736-8000
Party name: Floyd G. Elmore
Attorneys for Respondent
David Lawrence Schenberg
    Counsel of Record
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC
7700 Bonhomme Ave., Ste.650
St. Louis, MO 63105

david.schenberg@odnss.com
314-802-3956
Party name: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.