No. 17-212
Title:Clarence Nagelvoort, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:August 10, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2766)
   Decision Date:May 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 11, 2017)
Sep 07 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 11, 2017.
Oct 06 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 9, 2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

aunikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Clarence Nagelvoort
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States